Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hoop, John P, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cavazos, Alvaro Rolando, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, Granted/Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.