Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gill, Sunjeet, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Chaloupka, Michael J, against Sotelo, Antonio Martinez, Bob Holzer Automotive, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.