Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Esola, Mark Stephen, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against United Launch Alliance, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Venue Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Challenge of Venue Letter, Filed | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Challenge of Venue Letter, Filed | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt, Filed | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.