Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ochoa, Rodney L, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Misc Petition - Name Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name, Filed | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Name Change
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication, Filed | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause for Change of Name, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.