Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding LLC vs xxxxx xxxxxxxxxx
A Limited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 case was filed by Midland Funding Llc, represented by Hankins, Alec W, against Xxxxxxxxxx, Xxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. Judge Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 23, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Barbara County, CA
Category
Limited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - under 10,000
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Venue, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |