Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hankins, Alec W, against Xxxxxxxxxx, Xxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2018 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service, Filed | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Venue, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.