Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oportun Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Garcia Juan Carlos Guzman, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Compton with Victor M. Acevedo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCompton |
Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 04, 2018Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 04, 2018Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 04, 2018Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents
Date: July 24, 2018Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due
Date: July 24, 2018Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: July 24, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: August 28, 2018Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)
Date: October 02, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: October 02, 2018Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)
Date: October 02, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
Date: December 04, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: December 04, 2018Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Oportun Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by:
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/04/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.