Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Esparza Rita, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Gutierrez Retiguin Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Stephen V. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 07, 2018 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution Judge: Armando |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Department M, Cawelti, Stephen, Presiding Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Stephen |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) Filed by Respondent |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Judge Pro Tem/Referee Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Mail Filed by Respondent |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response - Domestic Violence Filed by Respondent |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.