Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BOECKMANN AUTOMOTIVE, LLC VS CRUZ TECUM, ET AL.
On January 11, 2018 a small claims (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by Boeckmann Automotive Llc Dba Galpin Honda, against Itzep Erlinda Aka Erlinda M Itzep, and Tecum Cruz Aka Cruz Itzep Tecum, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Andrew E. Cooper presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 14, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Chatsworth
Category
Small Claims (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ - Return Wholly Satisfied ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 25.00; Interest Credits: 6.90; Principal Credits: 544.50; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied | |
November 19, 2018 | Writ - Return - Writ - Return Wholly Satisfied | ||
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 11/19/2018 | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment entered on ; Status Date changed from to | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment entered on ; Status Date changed from to ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment entered on 10/26/2018 ; Status Date changed from 03/29/2018 to 10/26/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judgment entered on 10/26/2018 ; Status Date changed from 10/26/2018 to 10/26/2018 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Cruz Tecum (Defendant); Erlinda Itzep (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction |
|
October 25, 2018 | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | ||
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 07, 2018 | Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles) | ||
March 29, 2018 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Boeckmann Automotive, LLC DBA Galpin Honda against Defendant Erlinda Itzep AKA Erlinda M Itzep and Defendant Cruz Tecum AKA Cruz Itzep Tecum on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Boeckmann Automotive, LLC on for the principal amount of $434.50 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $544.50, joint and several. |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party |
|
March 29, 2018 | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) | ||
March 29, 2018 | Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/29/2018 | ||
March 29, 2018 | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) | ||
March 29, 2018 | Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial) | ||
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2018 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 03/29/2018; Result Type to Held
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Boeckmann Automotive, LLC DBA Galpin Honda against Defendant Erlinda Itzep AKA Erlinda M Itzep and Defendant Cruz Tecum AKA Cruz Itzep Tecum on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Boeckmann Automotive, LLC on 01/11/2018 for the principal amount of $434.50 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $544.50, joint and several. |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/29/2018; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Cruz Tecum (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erlinda Itzep (Defendant); Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: |
|
February 27, 2018 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 27, 2018 | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) | ||
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erlinda Itzep (Defendant); Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/21/2018 |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Cruz Tecum (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/21/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2018 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
February 16, 2018 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No |
|
February 16, 2018 | Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) | ||
February 16, 2018 | Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) | ||
February 16, 2018 | Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) | ||
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/29/2018 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erlinda Itzep (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: |
|
February 05, 2018 | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) | ||
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Erlinda Itzep (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/30/2018 |
|
January 12, 2018 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)]; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 12, 2018 | Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)] | ||
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2018 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44
Judge: Andrew E. Cooper |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Andrew E. Cooper in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Cruz Tecum (Defendant); Erlinda Itzep (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name) | ||
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Cruz Tecum (Defendant); Erlinda Itzep (Defendant) |
|