Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brodbeck Lori Denise, against Moeller Christopher A, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Rick Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: October 01, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 01, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: October 01, 2018Declaration (name extension) - OF NON-MILITARY STATUS
Date: October 01, 2018Declaration (name extension) - Declaration non service
Date: October 16, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: July 11, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order/Notice of Hearing)
Date: July 02, 2020Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion
Date: July 02, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 02, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 09, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: October 20, 2020Order (name extension) - Order ALLOWING EXECUTION ON THE JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Declaration OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Declaration non service; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER A MOELLER (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER A MOELLER (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order/Notice of Hearing) of 07/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.