Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese Harlan M., against Davie Brooke K, represented by Madaen Bahram, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraciela L. Freixes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Declaration Service by Mail; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: September 12, 2022Declaration of Venue; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. on , judgment entered on as to BROOKE K DAVIE is
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKE K DAVIE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BROOKE K DAVIE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Stipulated Judgment; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKE K DAVIE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: September 19, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: September 19, 2018Declaration (name extension) - of Venue
Date: September 19, 2018Complaint
Date: September 19, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 19, 2018Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 15, 2018Answer - Answer
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial
Date: November 28, 2018Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order FOR JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2019Stipulated Judgment - Stipulated Judgment
Date: May 22, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 07, 2020Motion to Amend Judgment - Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: January 07, 2020Order (name extension) - Order GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT
Date: March 11, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: March 11, 2020Judgment - Judgment AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Service by Mail
Date: September 12, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 12, 2022Declaration of Venue; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BROOKE K DAVIE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Stipulated Judgment; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKE K DAVIE (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BROOKE K DAVIE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment) of 03/11/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.