Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Modern Adjustment Bureau, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Love Franklin Jay, against Pereyra Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2018 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Declaration Computation Of Interest; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Business & Professions Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Default entered as to EDUARDO PEREYRA; On the Complaint filed by MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU on
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO PEREYRA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Declaration RE 1033; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO PEREYRA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)
Date: August 02, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 02, 2018Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: August 02, 2018Complaint
Date: August 02, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: August 02, 2018Application for Publication - Application for Order to Publish
Date: April 29, 2019Order for Publication - Order for Publication
Date: May 01, 2019Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication
Date: June 26, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Computation Of Interest
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE 1033
Date: August 05, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 05, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: August 05, 2019Default Judgment - Default Judgment
Date: August 15, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO PEREYRA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Publication; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff); As to: EDUARDO PEREYRA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Default entered as to EDUARDO PEREYRA; On the Complaint filed by MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU on 08/02/2018
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 1717.5 CC re: Attorney Fees; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration Computation Of Interest; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Declaration RE 1033; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: MODERN ADJUSTMENT BUREAU (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.