Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Salet Keri L., against Dykstra Jesse M, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: July 24, 2018Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: July 24, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 24, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: July 24, 2018Complaint
Date: July 24, 2018Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service
Date: August 22, 2018Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: April 15, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: June 25, 2019Request for Dismissal; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: April 15, 2019Declaration of Non Service; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JESSE M DYKSTRA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.