Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Ahumada Rogerio, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Graciela L. Freixes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Business & Professions Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Declaration VENUE; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROGERIO AHUMADA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Declaration Re: 1788; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: July 31, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: July 31, 2020; On the Complaint filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC on 06/01/2018
Date: July 31, 2020Declaration Re: Copies; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: July 31, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Declaration Re: 1033; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.