Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wong Jennifer Pei-Ting, against Escobar Jafet, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Karen Moskowitz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: May 25, 2018Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
Date: May 25, 2018Summons - on Complaint
Date: May 25, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 25, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 18, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: September 12, 2018Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: September 13, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 26, 2021Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: August 16, 2021Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: August 27, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: JAFET ESCOBAR (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.