Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS KARAPET ADZHEMYAN
On January 11, 2018 an other promissory note/collections case (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Chatsworth
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Rick Brown;Category
Other Promissory Note/Collections Case (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
1. Common Counts: Book Account,
Account Stated
2. Quantum Meruit-Reasonable Value
PRAYER AMOUNT: $4,291.12
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2022 | Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney | ||
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 25.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 502.12; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: | |
June 26, 2019 | Writ - Return - Writ - Return | ||
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 06/26/2019 | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (VENTURA): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: | |
May 31, 2019 | Writ - Return - Writ - Return | ||
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Writ of Execution (VENTURA): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/31/2019 | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (VENTURA); Issued by: Clerk; County: VENTURA | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-20 |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Default judgment entered for Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK against Defendant KARAPET ADZHEMYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on for the principal amount of $4,291.12 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $4,581.12. |
|
June 07, 2018 | hearing | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 07, 2018 | Default Judgment | ||
June 07, 2018 | Request for Dismissal | ||
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Default judgment entered for Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK, A UTAH STATE CHARTERED BANK against Defendant KARAPET ADZHEMYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL on the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on 01/11/2018 for the principal amount of $4,291.12 and costs of $290.00 for a total of $4,581.12. |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2018 | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant) |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on , Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-20 |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to KARAPET ADZHEMYAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: |
|
May 22, 2018 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
May 22, 2018 | Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 | ||
May 22, 2018 | Declaration (name extension) - RE: SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT | ||
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on 01/11/2018, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-20 |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant) |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to KARAPET ADZHEMYAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on 01/11/2018 |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant) |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to KARAPET ADZHEMYAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on |
|
May 04, 2018 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant) |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Default entered as to KARAPET ADZHEMYAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK on 01/11/2018 |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
March 05, 2018 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended) | ||
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/17/2018; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 22, 2018 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/17/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
January 11, 2018 | hearing | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
January 11, 2018 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
January 11, 2018 | Complaint | ||
January 11, 2018 | Summons - on Complaint | ||
January 11, 2018 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
January 11, 2018 | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) | ||
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/17/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff); As to: KARAPET ADZHEMYAN (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) |