Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leas, H.F. Rick, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time463 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Status RE: Filing of the First or Final Account Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal filed Withdrawal of Claim for Personal Income Tax |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal filed Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Creditor's Claim Amount: $864.27 |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Special Notice | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Termination of Proceedings and Discharge of Administrator with Will Annexes H.F. Rick Leas Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court First Amended Petition for Termination of Proceedings and Discharge of Administrator with Will Annexed, H.F. Rick Leas Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Generic) Order on First Amended Petition for Termination of Proceedings and Discharge of Administrator with Will Annexed, H.F. Rick Leas (cc emailed) Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal filed Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal filed Withdrawal of Claim for Personal Income Tax |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.