Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyna, Miguel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reyna, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time178 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Unrepresented Party PETITONER |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Unrepresented Party RESPONDENT |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX - Judgment docs w/MSA, envelopes |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Default shelf w/Judgment w/envls |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default entered as to respndent Kathy Reyna |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.