Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Potigian, Brenda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Potigian, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with David C. Kalemkarian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time173 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
1 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Kalemkarian, David |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent Request for Dismissal to FL Supervisor for Review |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Accepted Pending Judge's Review/Signature - Request for Dismissal |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent Request for Dismissal to FL Supervisor for Review |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Documents Accepted Pending Review/Signatrue - Request for Dismiss |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Party served: Dan Potigian Personal service date: 10/19/2018 |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent Fee Waiver to FLEX for Review |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution with Children | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Filed Complaint Issued Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.