Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Phelps, Marcel, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lara, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Robert G. Mangano presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2018 |
CategoryPetition Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Modification OSC/Motion CC, CV Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Letter | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Letter | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Marcel Phelps served 5/12/20 |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Marcel Phelps served 5/1/20 |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.