Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Banks, Lykeitha Janae, Castro, Indira, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2018 |
CategoryJoint Petition Dissolution |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time317 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Joint Petition for Summary Dissolution |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX: Jt Summary Judgment |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return Letter Letter mailed to each party |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Resubmitted Joint Petition Disso sent to FLEX attn:Rosie |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Joint Petition Dissolution | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Letter | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Joint Petition Dissolution | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to Judgment to FLEX w/ Envelopes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.