Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Navarro, Mia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Amaro, Greg, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Gamoian, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating FL Restraining Order Restraining Order Issued on 10/26/2018 shall be terminated. The custody order was modified on 3/22/18 Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge Guerra minute order. See attached. Petitioner and Respondent Present/Pro per Hearing Type: Notice of Motion/Child Custody/DV TRO Other: Petitioner has spoken with a DV Victim Advocate, and is requesting to remove the restraining order. Respondent states he is in AA, is attending therapy and anger management. The Court grants the request to remove the restraining order. Parties request to restore the previous custody plan. The Court addresses FC 3044. Respondent has completed a parenting class, an alcohol program and counseling, and has complied with conditions to the restraining order. Respondent confirms. The Court finds FC 3044 has been rebutted. Parties are reconciling. Parties are to have Joint Legal and Joint Physical Custody and vistiation shall be as mutually agreed upon between the parties. |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Remove RO and restore custody Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Child Custody and Visitation Order Signed by Judge | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service served RFO 2.7.19 |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | OSC/Motions filed | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Child Custody and Visitation Order Signed by Judge Gamoian CORRECTED (Orig. issued 9/27/18) |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge Gamoian Minute Order: See Attached ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, GOOD CAUSE APPEARING; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Court Orders an amendment to the Minute Order, Child Custody & Visitation Order and Restraining Order filed on September 27th, 2018. Court Orders father shall be allowed to exercise his supervised visitation at Comprehensive Youth Services. Father's supervised visitation shall be the only exception to the restraining order that was issued on 9/27/18 and corrected on 10/26/18. Court Orders visits once a week for no more than 2 hours per visit shall remain. /s/Judge Gamoian |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Court's Own Motion Minute Order, Corrected Custody Order and Corrected Restraining Order from 9/27/18 Hrg. was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 10/26/18. Parties served: Mia Navarro vs Greg Amaro |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Child Custody and Visitation Order Signed by Judge signed by L Gamoian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.