Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beneficial State Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Gonzales, Macario Roberto, Gutierrez, Mary Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Pebet, Noelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
Category09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued County: San Bernardino Amount: $10,837.03 |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $29.54 |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued County: Sacramento Amount: $10,837.03 |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s) Without Prejudice Does: 1-10 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment Judgment Received Forward to: Dept 404 on 6/4/2019 |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Request to Enter Default |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration in Support of Default Judgment |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Macario Roberto Gonzales |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.