Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sanchez, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carter, Daniel L, against Chay, Pether Robert Thao, Ramirez, Ruben, Vang, Ba, represented by Cooper, Joseph D., Sr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2018 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial550 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury and property damage case filed by Jose Sanchez against Ba Vang, Robert Pether, and Ruben Ramirez. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, resulting in legal injuries and damages to the plain...
Civil case cover sheet
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Service
Date: February 26, 2019Proof of Service
Date: February 26, 2019Request for Default Received
Date: February 26, 2019Proof of Service
Date: February 13, 2019Summons issued and filed
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 08, 2018Proof of Service
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: December 31, 2018Motion filed
Date: May 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: February 05, 2019Proof of Service
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Service
Date: February 13, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 25, 2019Amended Document Filed
Date: March 22, 2019Request to Enter Default
Date: February 26, 2019Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 08, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 22, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 25, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Service
Date: March 25, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 02, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 02, 2019Notice Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Proof of Service
Date: April 05, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 02, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 23, 2019Proof of Service
Date: April 23, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 02, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: April 23, 2019List filed
Date: May 05, 2021Motion filed
Date: May 12, 2021List filed
Date: May 12, 2021Trial brief filed
Date: May 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Trial brief filed
Date: May 05, 2021Stipulation Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 03, 2022List filed
Date: May 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 14, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 14, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: May 10, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 21, 2022Request Filed
Date: March 18, 2019Answer Filed
Date: February 05, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: November 08, 2018Reply filed
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: February 13, 2019Reply filed
Date: April 23, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: February 13, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 07, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: February 13, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 13, 2019ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: February 14, 2019Reply filed
Date: April 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 25, 2020Request Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: March 25, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: May 02, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 01, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 13, 2019Opposition filed
Date: March 18, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 08, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 04, 2019Opposition filed
Date: April 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment and certificate of mailing |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continue Trial David Milligan Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
4-12-22 MP&A In Support Of Reply To Opposition To Motion To Reopen Discovery Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Reply To Opposition To Motion To Reopen Discovery |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition filed 04/21/22 Defendants' Opp to plaintiffs MTC |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
3-30-22 Supplemental Declaration of Manvir Kaur ISO Motion To Continue Trial - HRG 4/21/22 Declaration Filed Supplemental Declaration of Manvir Kaur ISO Motion To Continue Trial Date and Re-Open Discovery |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/14/22 - Declaration of David Milligan Declaration Filed of David L. Milligan Re Meet and Confer |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
3/14/22 - Declaration of Jose Sanchez Declaration Filed of Jose Sanchez ISO Motion to Continue Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.