Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kelso, Shaundonna, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Busick, Mark B., Stokes, Travis R., against City Of Fresno, represented by Czeshinski, Michael J., Larres, Louis A, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Tharpe, D presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial580 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions548 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 24, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 22, 2019Response filed
Date: January 13, 2020Amended Document Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Notice Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Civil Complaint filed
Date: January 23, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: February 11, 2020Cross Complaint Filed
Date: March 04, 2019Amendment filed
Date: March 03, 2020Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 24, 2020Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 23, 2020Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: January 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 10, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: October 10, 2019Amendment filed
Date: April 03, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: February 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 23, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 17, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: September 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Estimated 5 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties Estimated 5 days |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference per order signed 02/21/20 Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Assignment of Judge for all Purposes. |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Chambers Work- Pre |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.