Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Luscomb, Christian Alexander, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cabrera, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2018 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
Petition for name change filed
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 07, 2019Name Change OSC Filed
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Publication |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: Guerra, Amy |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Denied
Judge: Diaz, Monica |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for name change filed | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Name Change OSC Filed Hearing set on: Date: 12/17/2018 Time: 8:30am Dept: 404 |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil case cover sheet | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature (Order Denied; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Fee Waiver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.