Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cynthia Gayle Richardson vs. Anntionette Jefferson
A 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case was filed by Richardson, Cynthia Gayle, against Jefferson, Anntionette Edwina, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 11, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Diaz, Monica;Category
43 Unlimited - Other Petition (not specified)
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
20 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Minute Order Attachment
Date: Oct 01, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service re: Proof of Personal Service |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing and TRO Temporary Restraining Order Granted. Date:10/01/18 Time:8:30am Dept:404 Judge: Diaz, Monica |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: TRO File forwarded back to Clerk's Office for further processing on 09/13/2018. |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Diaz, Monica |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for orders to stop Harassment filed | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Notice of Hearing File forwarded back to Clerk's Office for further processing on 09/13/2018. |