Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ahmad, Elias, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bonakdar, Roger S., against Mann, Edward, Mann, Laura, Mann, Robert, represented by Demaria, Anthony N., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2018 |
Category22 Unlimited - Auto |
Time To Trial684 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time650 days |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 06, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: February 06, 2020ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: August 27, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: February 06, 2020Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: June 16, 2020Reply filed
Date: February 27, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition filed
Date: February 21, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 04, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: March 28, 2019Order filed
Date: April 04, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 28, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 07, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: September 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing *department change* |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
General Motion Relief from Bench Trial - Alyssa Melianosky Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only) and certificate of mailing |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney - Laura Mann Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney:Mccormick Barstow New Attorney:Anthony N. DeMaria |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney - Robert Mann Substitution of Attorney Filed Old Attorney:McCormick Barstow New Attorney:Anthony N DeMaria |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply filed Brief to Opposition to Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.