Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Insurance Company Of The West, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Linsao, Miljoy B, against Cemex Construction Materials Pacific, Llc, represented by Pepper, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Civil Complaint filed
Date: September 04, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Jury Deposit Notice Filed of Jury Deposit |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee Answer Filed to complaint |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Cemex Construction Materials Pacific LLC |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Cemex Construction Materials Pacific LLC- DEFECTIVE: Item 3b is marked without listing Agent for Service/Authorized Person to Accept. |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint Cemex Construction Materials Pacific LLC- DEFECTIVE: Item 3b is marked without listing Agent for Service/Authorized Person to Accept. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Cemex, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.