Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Virginia Sarabian, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hoppe, Theodore W., against Syngenta Seeds, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, Ts&L Seed Company, represented by Mackay, Andrew S., Nugent, Matthew P, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management115 days |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial815 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: June 20, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 01, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 20, 2019Notice Filed
Date: June 25, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 05, 2019Request Filed
Date: January 09, 2019Request Filed
Date: April 05, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 22, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Proof of Service
Date: August 01, 2019Reply filed
Date: April 09, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: April 24, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 03, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 07, 2019Reply filed
Date: January 15, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 03, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: December 18, 2018ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: November 14, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 09, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 26, 2019Notice Filed
Date: September 20, 2019Answer Filed
Date: August 16, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: August 01, 2019Request Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 25, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 02, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 23, 2019Opposition filed
Date: January 09, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 18, 2018Demurrer Filed
Date: December 18, 2018Amendment filed
Date: August 17, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: August 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Requested by both parties; Time est. 7-10 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing *Department Change* |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
3560434_51420200508S Notice Filed Notice Of Change Of Handling Atttorneys |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC - ADR Stipulation
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed of Change of Address |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation ADR Stipulation Mediation filed Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Judge Donald Black (ret.) |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Referral to ADR | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.