Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bmo Harris Bank N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Khatchadourian, Raffi, against Virk, Rashpal, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Black, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBlack, Donald Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2018 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Application and Order for Examination
Date: January 06, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 27, 2021Application and Order for Examination
Date: March 30, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 07, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 24, 2021Request to Enter Default
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 20, 2018Request for Court Judgment
Date: November 30, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: November 30, 2018Proof of Service
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 20, 2018Proof of Service
Date: July 30, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 19, 2018Civil case cover sheet
Date: July 20, 2018Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 12, 2019Request for Default Received
Date: October 16, 2018Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: March 12, 2019Return filed
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 03, 2021Acknowledgement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment filed
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 04, 2020Request for Court Judgment
Date: February 04, 2019Order filed
Date: January 11, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: November 30, 2018Proof of Service
Date: August 03, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: July 20, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 14, 2022Proof of Service
Date: July 06, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 26, 2022Proof of Service
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: September 28, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 13, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 28, 2022Civil Complaint filed
Date: July 20, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 13, 2019Application and Order for Examination
Date: August 08, 2019Dismissal Not Entered
Date: February 04, 2019Judgment Received
Date: February 04, 2019Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: February 04, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 17, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: December 26, 2018Judgment Received
Date: November 30, 2018Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)
Date: November 30, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 30, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 13, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: October 29, 2018Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
01/13/2023 Minute Order Attachment Minute Order Attachment |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued OX
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Roger Stewart specially appearing |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
10.28.22 Minute Order Minute Order Attachment |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Attorney John Robertson for Plaintiff |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination - Bench Warrant
Judge: Cullers, Mark |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
9/28/2022-Proof of Service OX BW Proof of Service OX-Bench Warrant |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
GN-23 Notice of Calendar Setting Notice of Hearing OX-Bench Warrant |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
8.26.22 Minute Order Minute Order Attachment |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person Attorney John Dyers for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.