Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Orosco, Flora, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Helsel, Jason A., against City Of Sanger, represented by Myers, Gregory L, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management1 days |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2018 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial337 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions345 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time347 days |
Judgment Received
Date: May 01, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: May 21, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 24, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 25, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: April 29, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 30, 2019ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: August 28, 2018Notice Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Statement filed
Date: April 16, 2019Opposition filed
Date: April 18, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 17, 2018Opposition filed
Date: April 18, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Objection filed
Date: April 25, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Collected | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Deposit, payment,disbursment Jury Fees Collected |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received **Order signed and forwarded to the clerks office for further processing on 05.03.19** PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 503 Judgment on Special Verdict |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Civil Jury Trial Day 5 |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Verdict filed | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Filed | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Instructions Given |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.