Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Burkhart, Steve, filed a(n) 42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) case represented by Pro Se, against Ahlin, Pam, State Department Of State Hospitals, State Of California, represented by Pansa, Marianne A., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2018 |
Category42 Unlimited - Other Complaint (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time687 days |
Order Denied
Date: April 30, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 21, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 29, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: May 30, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: June 29, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 02, 2018Notice Filed
Date: December 18, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 21, 2019Request Filed
Date: May 30, 2018Reply filed
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: April 05, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Opposition filed
Date: April 10, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 05, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 06, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: October 22, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 25, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: July 30, 2018Request Filed
Date: September 18, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 19, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: September 09, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: September 25, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 18, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 26, 2018Ex parte Filed
Date: March 06, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 16, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 18, 2018Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 26, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 14, 2019Order filed
Date: December 17, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 14, 2019Order filed
Date: April 10, 2019Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 03, 2019Opposition filed
Date: May 02, 2019Reply filed
Date: May 08, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 30, 2018Motion filed
Date: June 29, 2018Opposition filed
Date: April 10, 2019Opposition filed
Date: September 09, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: March 25, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 01, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 09, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 06, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 10, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: September 18, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: December 13, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 28, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: May 24, 2019Request Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 23, 2019Request Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Request for Judical Notice
Date: May 02, 2019Notice Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Reply filed
Date: October 05, 2018Request Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Request Filed
Date: December 13, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: October 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Order Received for Signature (Forwarded to dept. 402)Stipulation to Continue October 15, 2019 Case Management Conference and Proposed Order; Declaration of Marianne A. Pansa |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Judical Notice in support of Opposition of Defendants' Demurrer to the Third Amended Complaint |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition filed to Defendants Demurrer of the Third Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support Thereof |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Filed for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Demurrer Filed to Third Amended Complaint |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing Second Amended Complaint |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order filed to Continue June 4, 2019 Case Management Conference and Order Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.