Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rodriquez, Ernesto, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Railway Company, Bnsf, represented by Schaff, Jason W., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Diaz, Monica presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management117 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial1167 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions979 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: August 17, 2018Reply filed
Date: September 15, 2020Request Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: December 30, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 18, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: February 17, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: March 18, 2021Opposition filed
Date: March 01, 2021Objection filed
Date: March 11, 2021Statement filed
Date: March 01, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 18, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 25, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: March 18, 2021Order Granted
Date: March 29, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: March 26, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 05, 2021Order filed
Date: June 17, 2021Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: March 21, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 05, 2018Answer Filed
Date: April 12, 2018Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: June 05, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 01, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 26, 2020Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: October 15, 2019Notice Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Civil case cover sheet
Date: February 28, 2018Summons issued and filed
Date: March 01, 2018Notice Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Proof of Service
Date: July 13, 2018Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 28, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: September 16, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 30, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 30, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice Filed
Date: October 23, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 08, 2020Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: March 02, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 15, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 30, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: February 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 01, 2021Objection filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: December 21, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 11, 2021Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: May 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: December 20, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: March 29, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: June 17, 2021Reply filed
Date: March 11, 2021Response filed
Date: March 11, 2021Motion filed
Date: August 26, 2020Statement filed
Date: December 30, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 26, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: October 09, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 30, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: July 03, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 25, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: June 07, 2018Proof of Service
Date: March 23, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: February 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial jury both; 5 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial jury both; 5 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed Trial continued to: October 3 2022 in Dept. 503. Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Signed order forwarded to clerks office 05/12/22 Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial (Orders) |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed Trial continued to: 5/31/2022 at 9:00 AM in Dept. 503 TRR Continued to: 5/27/2022 at 9:30 AM in Dept 503 MSC Continued to: 4/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rm 575 Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.