Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carpenter, Meta, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Norman, Sophia, represented by Janisse, Ryan Michael, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management117 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial306 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time555 days |
Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 13, 2019Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: July 11, 2019Opposition filed
Date: September 16, 2019Opposition filed
Date: September 19, 2019Opposition filed
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: July 15, 2019Motion filed
Date: January 30, 2019Opposition filed
Date: July 12, 2019Request for Judical Notice
Date: October 19, 2018Request for Judical Notice
Date: April 13, 2018Response filed
Date: June 04, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 05, 2019Opposition filed
Date: December 05, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: November 20, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: November 20, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: October 03, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 03, 2019Motion filed
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: October 03, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 02, 2019Response filed
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: December 19, 2018Opposition filed
Date: December 17, 2018Opposition filed
Date: December 17, 2018Reply filed
Date: December 12, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 06, 2018ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: December 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 02, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 19, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 05, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 05, 2018Response filed
Date: July 02, 2018Response filed
Date: June 28, 2018Motion filed
Date: June 04, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 30, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 13, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: January 03, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Set Aside Dismissal Meta Carpenter OTC Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
July 10, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion: By Plaintiff to set aside dismissal Tentative Ruling: To deny. Explanation: The court is empowered “upon any terms as may be just, [to] relieve a party or his or her legal representative from ...
Judge: Rosemary McGuire |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Document Notice of Hearing **PLEASE NOTE: DEPARTMENT CHANGE** |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Certificate of Mailing was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 5/28/20 . Parties served: Meta Carpenter |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Calendar Setting with Certificate of Mailing |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Continuance and Certificate of Mailing **Motion - Set Aside Dismissal set for 04.29.20 is continued to 05.27.20** |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.