Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A&A Electric Co., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wyckoff Heidi Marie, against Csb Contractors Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly E. Kendig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly E. Kendig Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2018 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time32 days |
Complaint
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 19, 2018Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 19, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 19, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 26, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 31, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: November 20, 2018Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: November 20, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 31, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.