Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New Yourk As Successor Indunture Trustee To Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association For Cwheq Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust Series 2007-B, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Edwards Brian S. Esq., against Herrin Brandon, Herrin Richard A, Herrin Ryan, Herrin Taylor, Herrin Teresa M., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2018 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time346 days |
Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 16, 2018Complaint
Date: October 16, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 30, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 14, 2019Application - Application Application for Default Judgment
Date: February 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 07, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 27, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 13, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 02, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 16, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 14, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 20, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 11, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: July 17, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: August 21, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 11, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 27, 2019Application (Application for Default Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: August 21, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 27, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 11, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re Status of De...))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference and OSC Re Service of Process on Heirs)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00DUE DILIGENCE DECLARATION BY PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR REGARDING THE HEIRS OF DECEDENT RICHARD A. HERRIN.
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00DUE DILIGENCE DECLARATION BY PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR REGARDING THE HEIRS OF DECEDENT RICHARD A. HERRIN
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.