Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Burks Annie Marie, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Ramsay Blake, "Doe" Ramsin, "Doe" Hayek, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenny C. Osorio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Case Voided) |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 11, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 11, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT'S RULING RE NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION)
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: October 30, 2018Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: November 08, 2018Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: November 08, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Non-Complex Determination) of 10/26/2018)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court's Ruling Re Non-Complex Determination))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court))
Date: October 30, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.