Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Galindo Edgar, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kohen Isaac, Rostamian Claude A, against Fca Us Llc, represented by Proudfoot Douglas A., Proudfoot Matthew M, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa Hart Cole Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: December 05, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: April 17, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs)
Date: September 22, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees (COURT COSTS, AND LITIGATION EXPENSES)
Date: May 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/17/2020)
Date: April 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.