Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mortimer, Barbara E, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2018 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Amended Petition
Date: July 05, 2018Request
Date: July 25, 2018Petition Hearing
Date: July 31, 2018Ptn or Opp - Concerning Internal Affairs of Trust PR17200
Date: June 26, 2018Petition or Opposition - Order Concerning Part. Transaction
Date: August 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing First Amended Petition to Compel Trustee to Account; Remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee; and Surcharge Fees Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Mortimer, Barbara Substitution of Attorney |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Petition Hearing First Amended Petition to Compel Trustee to Account; Rempove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee; and Surcharge Fees Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling - Hear Counsel | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Consolidated for All Purposes to 18PR00239 | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Petition to Compel Accounting, Remove Trustee and Surcharge Trustee Petition or Opposition - Order Concerning Part. Transaction |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
First Amended Petition to Compel Trustee to Account; remove Trustee and Appoint Successor Trustee; and Surcharge Trustee Petition Hearing Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Continued Petitioner's request to continue the hearing to 8/21/18 at 9:00am is granted. The Court will sign the order to continue submitted by Petitioner. Petitioner to provide notice of the Order. |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.