Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Rie Hirabaru Rubin, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Brian Danitz, against Stephen M. Peters, Peters Peters, Andrew Rubin, Does 1-20, Inclusive, represented by Kendall A Layne, Michael F. Donner, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Civil Unlimited with Susan Greenberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseCivil Unlimited |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Susan Greenberg |
|
August 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference to trail Judge: Gerald J. Buchwald |
|
August 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Status Conference
Judge: Sean P. Dabel |
|
July 25, 2019 | Document_Filed |
Order Type: GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT ANDREW RUBIN'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT Signed by: JUDGE GREENBERG Date Signed: 7/25/19 |
|
July 22, 2019 | Document_Filed | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
July 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion to Sanction Defendant Andrew Rubin's Notice of Motion filed 6/5/19 and Motion for Sanctions under California Code of Civil Procedure Section 128.7 Judge: Susan Greenberg |
|
July 19, 2019 | Document_Filed |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
July 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion to Sanction DEFENDANT ANDREW RUBIN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 128.7 Judge: Davis, Iii, Leland |
|
July 18, 2019 | Document_Filed |
Proposed Order Received FWD TO DEPT 1 FOR SIGNATURE; ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT |
|
July 18, 2019 | Document_Filed |
Proof of Service by MAIL of LETTER TO JUDGE GREENBERG;ETC served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.