Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Xxxx Xxxxxxx Xxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.