Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mirza, Maykel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter | |
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation: Unsigned, Accident, or CHP Fixit | |
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.