Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jasso, Oscar, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear MSB | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Assessment Failure To Appear | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Failure to Appear Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.