Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mayugba, Dennis Sebastion, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Traffic School Certificate Filed | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Traffic School Completed | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.