Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Oliver, Neal, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Meredith, Lynne R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2012 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Completed | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release on Dismissals | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Meredith, Lynne R |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | *Collections: Updated Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.