Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Harris, Anna L, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Berry Sr., Andrew S, in the jurisdiction of Marion County. This case was filed in Marion County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2024 |
CategoryJp - Juvenile Paternity |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, IN |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Establish Child Support | |
April 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Intervene ---- 4/12/2024 : Martha Mondou McDermott Order to Appear ---- 4/12/2024 : Martha Mondou McDermott Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/12/2024 : Martha Mondou McDermott |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Intervene | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Petition to Establish Child Support scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 1:00 PM. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear 7/10/24 AT 1 PM |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition to Establish Child Support Filed VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH SUPPORT PURSUANT TO EXECUTION OF PATERNITY AFFIDAVIT |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed SUMMONS |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Intervene Filed STATES MOTION TO INTERVENE |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed LIMITED APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY IN CIVIL CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.