Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
English, Paula, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Dubois County. This case was filed in Dubois County Superior Courts Circuit with Karen A. Werner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2024 |
CategoryGu - Guardianship |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDubois County, IN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance ---- 5/1/2024 : Joseph English |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance ---- 5/1/2024 : Ralph Christopher Melbourne |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance Order Granting Leave to Withdraw Appearance |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Appearance Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel |
|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 4/19/2024 : Bridget Gabrielle Cantrell;Ralph Christopher Melbourne |
|
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting ---- 4/19/2024 : Joseph English |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Guardian's Petition for Reimbursement of Guardian's Expenses | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed Guardian's Petition for Fees |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Inventory Filed Inventory |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Instructions to Guardian |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.