Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Teresa M. Mund, filed a(n) Family case represented by Pro Se, against Craig S. Eberlein, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Family.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2002 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2003 | Action |
Judgment 241310-Judgment: Court Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
February 21, 2003 | Action |
Document: Other 299510-Appearance, Stipulation and Waiver Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
November 15, 2002 | Action |
Declaration 299210-Declaration of Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per |
|
September 23, 2002 | Action |
Declaration 299210-Declaration of Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
August 06, 2002 | Action |
Warrant: Issued 232110-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
August 06, 2002 | Action |
Summons: Issued and Filed 231210-Summons Filed Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
July 19, 2002 | Action |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |
|
July 19, 2002 | Action |
Summons: Issued and Filed 231110-Summons Issued Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
January 01, 1800 | Action |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.