Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Black Bear Holdings Llc, Doing Business As Black Bear Creek Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, Gentry, Nyerra U, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 12/20/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 1:30 PM. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.